U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Bird v. Corizon Health Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 05, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [In Limine]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 16, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Quash]
  • August 03, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • July 02, 2021: [Response]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 23, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 17, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Opposition]
  • June 07, 2021: [Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Opposition]
  • May 10, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Opposition]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 16, 2021: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2021: [Objection]
  • April 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 12, 2021: [Response]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2021: [Quash]
  • March 22, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 22, 2021: [Response]
  • March 22, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response]
  • March 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 09, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Quash]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2021: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Objection]
  • January 21, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2021: [Objection]
  • January 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Response]
  • December 31, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 28, 2020: [Objection]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 22, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Regarding Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 03, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 28, 2020: [Opposition]
  • September 21, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [Response]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Strike]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.