U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Byron Town Council v. Campos
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 02, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 02, 2021: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 02, 2021: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 22, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 15, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 05, 2021: [Opposition]
  • January 05, 2021: [Objection]
  • January 04, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 29, 2020: [In Limine]
  • December 29, 2020: [Quash]
  • December 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • December 29, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 05, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • April 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Removal]
  • March 24, 2020: [Complaint]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.