U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Pulham v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 26, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.