U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Kelley v. Swan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 08, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Mediation]
  • February 18, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.