U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Forth v. Laramie County School District No 1
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 10, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 08, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Designation]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2021: [In Limine]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 15, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 29, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 22, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • June 22, 2021: [Brief]
  • June 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 01, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 13, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Entry]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.