U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Szablewski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 16, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.