U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Brown v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Court)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.