U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Allen v. Carr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 18, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 03, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Mediation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Response]
  • May 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 19, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 12, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • September 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Non-Dispositive]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 08, 2021: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2021: [Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 12, 2021: [Letter(s)]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Response]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 17, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response]
  • July 16, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2020: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • July 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 27, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 10, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.