U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Toth v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institution Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Response]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • April 15, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 01, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.