U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Willingham v. Taurus International Manufacturing Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 18, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2020: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.