U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00063
  • Case Name: WaterVation PLLC v. Shamrock Environmental Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Court)]
  • April 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Opposition]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 04, 2020: [Brief]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • April 27, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • April 27, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 23, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 20, 2020: [Remand]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Removal]
  • April 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 09, 2020: [Complaint]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.