U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Clevenger v. Guernsey WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Mediation]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Mediation]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 19, 2021: [Statement]
  • March 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • March 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 03, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 22, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • February 19, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • February 15, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 12, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • April 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.