U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Montgomery v. Guernsey WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 20, 2021: [Mediation]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Mediation]
  • May 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 22, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • March 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 05, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 04, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 12, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 20, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 29, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • April 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.