U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Van Dam v. Guernsey WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Mediation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • July 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • July 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 02, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 11, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 11, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 11, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • June 09, 2021: [Deposition]
  • June 09, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • June 08, 2021: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 07, 2021: [In Camera Inspections]
  • June 07, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Quash]
  • June 04, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Quash]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 26, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 25, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 18, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Mediation]
  • May 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • April 08, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • March 25, 2021: [Statement]
  • March 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 12, 2021: [Designation]
  • February 12, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 11, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • April 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.