U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Madera et al v. Hightower et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 14, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Removal]
  • April 17, 2020: [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.