U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Forest Service Chief et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 08, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 06, 2022: [Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 17, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 16, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 07, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 07, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 06, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 22, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 14, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2021: [Remanding Case to US Agency]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 09, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Response]
  • June 15, 2021: [Brief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Brief]
  • May 11, 2021: [Brief]
  • May 11, 2021: [(TRMD)Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 19, 2021: [Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Lift Stay]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 24, 2020: [Stay Case]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • July 23, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Intervene]
  • July 13, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Intervene]
  • June 26, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Report Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • April 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 20, 2020: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.