U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Kritner v. Jacobs Enterprise LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Mediation]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.