U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Houska v. Newkota Services & Rentals LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 20, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Brief]
  • July 01, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 05, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • May 19, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • April 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.