U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Swett v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.