U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Parkhurst v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [USCA Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 18, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 04, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.