U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Martinez et al v. Tungsten Parts Wyoming Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 17, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 13, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.