U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20190
  • Case Name: Deana Karen Brewster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.