U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00074
  • Case Name: LLL Company Inc v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Staying Case]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 17, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • December 04, 2020: [Statement]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 21, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 16, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.