U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Huffer v. Platte County Fair Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 14, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • August 03, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2020: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Praecipe]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of Complexity]
  • May 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.