U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Surrisi v. Grider et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 08, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • January 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 21, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 14, 2020: [Removal]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.