U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Melahn v. Newman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 27, 2022: [Response]
  • June 10, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Deposition]
  • May 31, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 31, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • May 27, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • May 25, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • May 24, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 23, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 23, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 17, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 13, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 11, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 26, 2022: [Objection]
  • April 25, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 20, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 18, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 04, 2022: [In Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Strike]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 12, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Response]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • August 02, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 12, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • November 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.