U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Kissinger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reply Brief]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Brief]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • October 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • July 22, 2020: [Status Report Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2020: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.