U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00080
  • Case Name: The Trial Lawyers College v. Gerry Spences Trial Lawyers College at Thunderhead Ranch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2024: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 12, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 11, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response]
  • October 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 06, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 04, 2022: [Proposed Verdict]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Designation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Objection]
  • September 30, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2022: [Disqualify]
  • September 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 29, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Designation]
  • September 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Designation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Objection]
  • September 23, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Dispositive]
  • September 20, 2022: [Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 30, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • August 24, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Staying Case]
  • August 15, 2022: [In Court Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 11, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response]
  • August 05, 2022: [Opposition]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • August 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 21, 2022: [In Court Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 15, 2022: [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [In Court Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Reply Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Quash]
  • May 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 12, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • April 12, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 30, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 29, 2022: [(TRMD)Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Mandate]
  • March 28, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2022: [Vacating Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2022: [Supplement]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 14, 2022: [Setting Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Response]
  • December 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 24, 2021: [Opposition]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 06, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Opposition]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Opposition]
  • November 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 14, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 05, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • November 05, 2021: [Disqualify]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 04, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 26, 2021: [(TRMD)Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • October 06, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 06, 2021: [Stay Discovery]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 04, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 22, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 14, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 07, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for In Camera Inspections]
  • June 09, 2021: [Opposition]
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Brief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • June 01, 2021: [Brief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • May 14, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [In Camera Inspections]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 22, 2021: [Mediation]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 16, 2021: [Opposition]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 02, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 26, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response]
  • January 04, 2021: [Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Response]
  • December 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2020: [Counterclaim]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 11, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 11, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • October 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 21, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • October 20, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2020: [Response]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 14, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2020: [Objection]
  • September 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 11, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 06, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 03, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 31, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • July 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 17, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 16, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 16, 2020: [Response]
  • June 15, 2020: [Objection]
  • June 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 12, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 12, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply Brief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 27, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 27, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • May 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • May 18, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.