U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00081
  • Case Name: L&S Trucking Inc v Dupre Logistics LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Remand]
  • May 26, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 20, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 15, 2020: [Removal]
  • May 14, 2020: [Complaint]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.