U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20226
  • Case Name: Trista Nicole Norred
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.