U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20238
  • Case Name: Heriberto Garza-Gallegos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2020
  • July 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.