U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20278
  • Case Name: Arthur John Pangelinan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2020
  • June 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.