U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Allen v. Natrona County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 22, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 16, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Suggestion of Death]
  • September 30, 2021: [Vacate]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 19, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 19, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 26, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • February 05, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • January 08, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • January 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • October 19, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • October 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Response]
  • August 19, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 03, 2020: [Financial Entry]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 17, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Letter(s)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.