U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Corizon Health Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Mandate]
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 04, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 21, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Designation]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Service]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 28, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.