U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Doe v. Teton County School District No 1 Board of Trustees et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • October 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Affidavit]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • September 29, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • September 15, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 15, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • September 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Mediation]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 19, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Financial Entry]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.