U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Westlake v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response]
  • May 11, 2021: [Objection]
  • May 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 27, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 27, 2021: [Application]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Remanding Case to US Agency]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Response]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • November 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.