U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Henderson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 25, 2021: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Quash]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • September 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.