U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Holthus v. Wyoming Secretary of State
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 30, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • June 30, 2020: [Response]
  • June 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint]
  • June 25, 2020: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.