U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Ramos v. Goshen County Detention Center Corporal et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Response]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 09, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 21, 2021: [Response]
  • July 14, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 11, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 02, 2021: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 24, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Letter(s)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 26, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 25, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 19, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 19, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 07, 2020: [Letter(s)]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 28, 2020: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 15, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Financial Entry]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.