U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Cano v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 02, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on 2255 Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 29, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.