U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Wells v. Connolly
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Supplement]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 27, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • August 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 20, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [In Limine]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 19, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 13, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
  • July 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.