U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Newton v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Mediation]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Mediation]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.