U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00125
  • Case Name: United States of America v. JR Simplot Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Consent Decree]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Approve Consent Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.