U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Chinwalla v. Welch Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2020: [Praecipe]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.