U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Shrestha v. Snow King Mountain Resort LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 03, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 06, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 01, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 03, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.