U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Rolle v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 30, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 29, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • June 21, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • June 13, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Mediation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • April 25, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Response]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 24, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Opposition]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 20, 2021: [Opposition]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Opposition]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • September 15, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 30, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 18, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 18, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 09, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 29, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Response]
  • July 26, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2021: [Opposition]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Supplement]
  • June 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Response]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 05, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2021: [Recusal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • March 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 03, 2021: [Letter(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 14, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 11, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 31, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 23, 2020: [Opposition]
  • November 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 12, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • November 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • September 18, 2020: [Martinez Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 18, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • August 13, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 12, 2020: [Recusal]
  • August 04, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 27, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 17, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 15, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.