U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Taz-Ag Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 22, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • August 04, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.