U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00132
  • Case Name: WPX Energy Inc v. Record TJ Ranch Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2021: [Opposition]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • October 29, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 11, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Stay Case]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 17, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • March 05, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 29, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 22, 2020: [Response]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 04, 2020: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 16, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • July 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.