U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Profile Properties LLC v. West American Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 20, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Response]
  • August 18, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • August 16, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Mediation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 28, 2021: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Brief]
  • July 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • July 17, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • July 17, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.