U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20349
  • Case Name: The Julie Bandemer Living Trust dated October 31,
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Ch. 11 Subch V Case Trustee's Report of NoDistribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2020
  • November 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Compensation]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Affidavit]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Compensation]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Dismiss Case]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order (Generic)]
  • October 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Response]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Certificate of Service]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Status Report]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Dismiss Case]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Operating Report]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Scheduling Hearing]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Generic Motion]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Employ]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Objection to]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order (Generic)]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Order (Generic)]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Clerks Notice of Intent to Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [341 Meeting Explanation]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Employ]
  • August 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Vacating Order]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Proposed Order]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Joint Administration]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Dennis, Mark David [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Tax Documents]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Cash Flow Statement]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corp/Ptnr Resolution]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Operations]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Balance Sheet for Small Business]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corp/Ptnr Resolution]
July, 2020
  • July 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.